berg80
Diamond Member
- Oct 28, 2017
- 18,062
- 15,191
- 2,320
.........................when you are a clownish buffoon who no one with any self-respect, talent, or concern for their reputation would work for.Good help is hard to find
Follow along with the video below to see how to install our site as a web app on your home screen.
Note: This feature may not be available in some browsers.
.........................when you are a clownish buffoon who no one with any self-respect, talent, or concern for their reputation would work for.Good help is hard to find
Trump Supporters HAVE to admit this....
LOL wrong! The left HAVE to admit that DC is swarming with DC swamp establishment rats and Trump is frequently forced to choose people from the swamp because he has no choice.
Especially the last 6 months. It happens when people get wise to you and everybody has his number now.It's downright spooky the way karma has repeatedly bitch slapped Trump these past three years.
If you're going to blindly support Trump every time he fires someone or someone quits under pressure from Trump, and blame the person leaving, then you have to admit he does NOT "hire the best people".
ALLLLL these people are BAD!
Can't have it both ways, buttheads.
- John Bolton, national security adviser: Fired Sept. 10, 2019
- Jason Greenblatt, special envoy for Middle East peace: Resignation announced on Sept. 5, 2019.
- Dan Coats, director of national intelligence: Resigned on July 28, 2019.
- R. Alexander Acosta, Labor secretary: Resigned on July 12, 2019.
- Patrick M. Shanahan, acting secretary of defense: Announced resignation June 18, 2019.
- Sarah Huckabee Sanders, White House press secretary: Announced resignation June 13, 2019
- Rod J. Rosenstein, deputy U.S. attorney general: Resignation effective May 11, 2019.
- Randolph D. Alles, director of the Secret Service: Resigned April 8, 2019.
- Kirstjen Nielsen, Homeland Security secretary: Resigned April 7, 2019.
- Linda E. McMahon, administrator of the Small Business Administration: Resignation announced March 29, 2019.
- Bill Shine, deputy chief of staff for communications: Resigned March 8, 2019 to manage Trump's communications operation.
- Heather Wilson, Air Force secretary: Resignation announced March 8, 2019.
- Brock Long, administrator of the Federal Emergency Management Agency: Resignation announced Feb. 13, 2019.
- Raj Shah, principal deputy press secretary: Resigned on Jan. 5, 2019.
- Jim Mattis, secretary of Defense: : Resignation announced Dec. 20, 2018.
- Ryan Zinke, secretary of Interior: : Resignation announced Dec. 15, 2018.
- Nick Ayers, chief of staff to Vice President Mike Pence: Resignation announced Dec. 9, 2018.
- John F. Kelly, White House chief of staff: Resignation announced Dec. 8, 2018.
- Jeff Sessions, U.S. attorney general: Fired Nov. 7, 2018.
- Nikki Haley, U.S. ambassador to the United Nations: Resignation announced Oct. 9, 2018.
- Donald McGahn, White House counsel: Resignation announced Aug. 29, 2018.
- Scott Pruitt, Environmental Protection Agency administrator: Resignation announced July 5, 2018.
- Joseph W. Hagin, deputy chief of staff: Resignation announced June 19, 2018.
- Maj. Gen. Ricky Waddell, deputy national security adviser: Resignation announced April 12, 2018.
- Nadia Schadlow, deputy national security adviser for strategy: Resignation announced April 11, 2018.
- Thomas Bossert, Homeland Security department adviser: Resigned April 10, 2018.
- Michael Anton, National Security Council spokesman: Resigned April 8, 2018.
- Rex Tillerson, secretary of State: Fired on March 13, 2018.
- Hope Hicks, White House communications director: Resigned March 29, 2018.
- David Shulkin, secretary of Veterans Affairs: Fired March 28, 2018.
- Lt. Gen. H. R. McMaster, national security adviser: Resignation announced March 22, 2018.
- Andrew McCabe, deputy director of the FBI: Fired March 16, 2018.
- Rick Dearborn, White House deputy chief of staff: Resigned March 16, 2018.
- John McEntee, Trump's personal aide: Resigned March 12, 2018.
- Gary Cohn, director of White House National Economic Council: Resignation announced March 6, 2018.
- Rachel Brand, associate U.S. attorney general: Resigned Feb. 9, 2018.
- David Sorensen, White House speechwriter: Resigned Feb. 9, 2018.
- Rob Porter, White House staff secretary: Resigned Feb. 7, 2018.
- Brenda Fitzgerald, director of the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention: Resigned Jan. 31, 2018.
- Carl Higbie, chief of external affairs for Corporation for National and Community Service: Resigned Jan. 18, 2018.
- Omarosa Manigault Newman, director of communications for the White House Office of Public Liaison: Fired Dec. 13, 2017.
- Dina Powell, deputy national security adviser for strategy: Resignation announced Dec. 8, 2017.
- Tom Price, secretary of Health and Human Services: Resigned Sept. 29, 2017.
- Keith Schiller, director of Oval Office operations: Resigned Sept. 20, 2017.
- Sebastian Gorka, adviser to Trump: Resigned Aug. 25, 2017.
- George Sifakis, director of White House Office of Public Liaison: Resignation announced Aug. 18, 2017.
- Stephen Bannon, chief strategist to Trump: Resigned Aug. 18, 2017.
- Anthony Scaramucci, White House communications director: Fired July 31, 2017.
- Reince Priebus, White House chief of staff: Resigned July 28, 2017.
- Sean Spicer, White House press secretary: Resigned July 21, 2017.
- Mike Dubke, White House communications director: Resigned June 2, 2017.
- K.T. McFarland, deputy national security adviser: Resigned May 19, 2017.
- James Comey, director of the FBI: Fired May 9, 2017.
- Katie Walsh, White House deputy chief of staff: Resigned March 30, 2017.
- Michael T. Flynn, national security adviser: Resigned Feb. 13, 2017.
Who has left the Trump administration? Here is a list of 55 major departures
<p>On Tuesday, President Donald Trump tweeted that he had fired John Bolton, his third national security adviser, over disagreements over major foreign policy challenges.</p>www.boston25news.com
If you're going to blindly support Trump every time he fires someone or someone quits under pressure from Trump, and blame the person leaving, then you have to admit he does NOT "hire the best people".
ALLLLL these people are BAD!
Can't have it both ways, buttheads.
- John Bolton, national security adviser: Fired Sept. 10, 2019
- Jason Greenblatt, special envoy for Middle East peace: Resignation announced on Sept. 5, 2019.
- Dan Coats, director of national intelligence: Resigned on July 28, 2019.
- R. Alexander Acosta, Labor secretary: Resigned on July 12, 2019.
- Patrick M. Shanahan, acting secretary of defense: Announced resignation June 18, 2019.
- Sarah Huckabee Sanders, White House press secretary: Announced resignation June 13, 2019
- Rod J. Rosenstein, deputy U.S. attorney general: Resignation effective May 11, 2019.
- Randolph D. Alles, director of the Secret Service: Resigned April 8, 2019.
- Kirstjen Nielsen, Homeland Security secretary: Resigned April 7, 2019.
- Linda E. McMahon, administrator of the Small Business Administration: Resignation announced March 29, 2019.
- Bill Shine, deputy chief of staff for communications: Resigned March 8, 2019 to manage Trump's communications operation.
- Heather Wilson, Air Force secretary: Resignation announced March 8, 2019.
- Brock Long, administrator of the Federal Emergency Management Agency: Resignation announced Feb. 13, 2019.
- Raj Shah, principal deputy press secretary: Resigned on Jan. 5, 2019.
- Jim Mattis, secretary of Defense: : Resignation announced Dec. 20, 2018.
- Ryan Zinke, secretary of Interior: : Resignation announced Dec. 15, 2018.
- Nick Ayers, chief of staff to Vice President Mike Pence: Resignation announced Dec. 9, 2018.
- John F. Kelly, White House chief of staff: Resignation announced Dec. 8, 2018.
- Jeff Sessions, U.S. attorney general: Fired Nov. 7, 2018.
- Nikki Haley, U.S. ambassador to the United Nations: Resignation announced Oct. 9, 2018.
- Donald McGahn, White House counsel: Resignation announced Aug. 29, 2018.
- Scott Pruitt, Environmental Protection Agency administrator: Resignation announced July 5, 2018.
- Joseph W. Hagin, deputy chief of staff: Resignation announced June 19, 2018.
- Maj. Gen. Ricky Waddell, deputy national security adviser: Resignation announced April 12, 2018.
- Nadia Schadlow, deputy national security adviser for strategy: Resignation announced April 11, 2018.
- Thomas Bossert, Homeland Security department adviser: Resigned April 10, 2018.
- Michael Anton, National Security Council spokesman: Resigned April 8, 2018.
- Rex Tillerson, secretary of State: Fired on March 13, 2018.
- Hope Hicks, White House communications director: Resigned March 29, 2018.
- David Shulkin, secretary of Veterans Affairs: Fired March 28, 2018.
- Lt. Gen. H. R. McMaster, national security adviser: Resignation announced March 22, 2018.
- Andrew McCabe, deputy director of the FBI: Fired March 16, 2018.
- Rick Dearborn, White House deputy chief of staff: Resigned March 16, 2018.
- John McEntee, Trump's personal aide: Resigned March 12, 2018.
- Gary Cohn, director of White House National Economic Council: Resignation announced March 6, 2018.
- Rachel Brand, associate U.S. attorney general: Resigned Feb. 9, 2018.
- David Sorensen, White House speechwriter: Resigned Feb. 9, 2018.
- Rob Porter, White House staff secretary: Resigned Feb. 7, 2018.
- Brenda Fitzgerald, director of the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention: Resigned Jan. 31, 2018.
- Carl Higbie, chief of external affairs for Corporation for National and Community Service: Resigned Jan. 18, 2018.
- Omarosa Manigault Newman, director of communications for the White House Office of Public Liaison: Fired Dec. 13, 2017.
- Dina Powell, deputy national security adviser for strategy: Resignation announced Dec. 8, 2017.
- Tom Price, secretary of Health and Human Services: Resigned Sept. 29, 2017.
- Keith Schiller, director of Oval Office operations: Resigned Sept. 20, 2017.
- Sebastian Gorka, adviser to Trump: Resigned Aug. 25, 2017.
- George Sifakis, director of White House Office of Public Liaison: Resignation announced Aug. 18, 2017.
- Stephen Bannon, chief strategist to Trump: Resigned Aug. 18, 2017.
- Anthony Scaramucci, White House communications director: Fired July 31, 2017.
- Reince Priebus, White House chief of staff: Resigned July 28, 2017.
- Sean Spicer, White House press secretary: Resigned July 21, 2017.
- Mike Dubke, White House communications director: Resigned June 2, 2017.
- K.T. McFarland, deputy national security adviser: Resigned May 19, 2017.
- James Comey, director of the FBI: Fired May 9, 2017.
- Katie Walsh, White House deputy chief of staff: Resigned March 30, 2017.
- Michael T. Flynn, national security adviser: Resigned Feb. 13, 2017.
Who has left the Trump administration? Here is a list of 55 major departures
<p>On Tuesday, President Donald Trump tweeted that he had fired John Bolton, his third national security adviser, over disagreements over major foreign policy challenges.</p>www.boston25news.com
I think he should have fired everyone who voted for a Democrat in the last election the day he took office. It's what Democrats do. But Trump believes you give people enough rope to hang themselves. Give em a chance......and if they fail, show em the door. Democrats go on a vendetta against anyone who doesn't kiss their asses.Thats just the top 55. Must be at least 750 and counting.If you're going to blindly support Trump every time he fires someone or someone quits under pressure from Trump, and blame the person leaving, then you have to admit he does NOT "hire the best people".
ALLLLL these people are BAD!
Can't have it both ways, buttheads.
- John Bolton, national security adviser: Fired Sept. 10, 2019
- Jason Greenblatt, special envoy for Middle East peace: Resignation announced on Sept. 5, 2019.
- Dan Coats, director of national intelligence: Resigned on July 28, 2019.
- R. Alexander Acosta, Labor secretary: Resigned on July 12, 2019.
- Patrick M. Shanahan, acting secretary of defense: Announced resignation June 18, 2019.
- Sarah Huckabee Sanders, White House press secretary: Announced resignation June 13, 2019
- Rod J. Rosenstein, deputy U.S. attorney general: Resignation effective May 11, 2019.
- Randolph D. Alles, director of the Secret Service: Resigned April 8, 2019.
- Kirstjen Nielsen, Homeland Security secretary: Resigned April 7, 2019.
- Linda E. McMahon, administrator of the Small Business Administration: Resignation announced March 29, 2019.
- Bill Shine, deputy chief of staff for communications: Resigned March 8, 2019 to manage Trump's communications operation.
- Heather Wilson, Air Force secretary: Resignation announced March 8, 2019.
- Brock Long, administrator of the Federal Emergency Management Agency: Resignation announced Feb. 13, 2019.
- Raj Shah, principal deputy press secretary: Resigned on Jan. 5, 2019.
- Jim Mattis, secretary of Defense: : Resignation announced Dec. 20, 2018.
- Ryan Zinke, secretary of Interior: : Resignation announced Dec. 15, 2018.
- Nick Ayers, chief of staff to Vice President Mike Pence: Resignation announced Dec. 9, 2018.
- John F. Kelly, White House chief of staff: Resignation announced Dec. 8, 2018.
- Jeff Sessions, U.S. attorney general: Fired Nov. 7, 2018.
- Nikki Haley, U.S. ambassador to the United Nations: Resignation announced Oct. 9, 2018.
- Donald McGahn, White House counsel: Resignation announced Aug. 29, 2018.
- Scott Pruitt, Environmental Protection Agency administrator: Resignation announced July 5, 2018.
- Joseph W. Hagin, deputy chief of staff: Resignation announced June 19, 2018.
- Maj. Gen. Ricky Waddell, deputy national security adviser: Resignation announced April 12, 2018.
- Nadia Schadlow, deputy national security adviser for strategy: Resignation announced April 11, 2018.
- Thomas Bossert, Homeland Security department adviser: Resigned April 10, 2018.
- Michael Anton, National Security Council spokesman: Resigned April 8, 2018.
- Rex Tillerson, secretary of State: Fired on March 13, 2018.
- Hope Hicks, White House communications director: Resigned March 29, 2018.
- David Shulkin, secretary of Veterans Affairs: Fired March 28, 2018.
- Lt. Gen. H. R. McMaster, national security adviser: Resignation announced March 22, 2018.
- Andrew McCabe, deputy director of the FBI: Fired March 16, 2018.
- Rick Dearborn, White House deputy chief of staff: Resigned March 16, 2018.
- John McEntee, Trump's personal aide: Resigned March 12, 2018.
- Gary Cohn, director of White House National Economic Council: Resignation announced March 6, 2018.
- Rachel Brand, associate U.S. attorney general: Resigned Feb. 9, 2018.
- David Sorensen, White House speechwriter: Resigned Feb. 9, 2018.
- Rob Porter, White House staff secretary: Resigned Feb. 7, 2018.
- Brenda Fitzgerald, director of the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention: Resigned Jan. 31, 2018.
- Carl Higbie, chief of external affairs for Corporation for National and Community Service: Resigned Jan. 18, 2018.
- Omarosa Manigault Newman, director of communications for the White House Office of Public Liaison: Fired Dec. 13, 2017.
- Dina Powell, deputy national security adviser for strategy: Resignation announced Dec. 8, 2017.
- Tom Price, secretary of Health and Human Services: Resigned Sept. 29, 2017.
- Keith Schiller, director of Oval Office operations: Resigned Sept. 20, 2017.
- Sebastian Gorka, adviser to Trump: Resigned Aug. 25, 2017.
- George Sifakis, director of White House Office of Public Liaison: Resignation announced Aug. 18, 2017.
- Stephen Bannon, chief strategist to Trump: Resigned Aug. 18, 2017.
- Anthony Scaramucci, White House communications director: Fired July 31, 2017.
- Reince Priebus, White House chief of staff: Resigned July 28, 2017.
- Sean Spicer, White House press secretary: Resigned July 21, 2017.
- Mike Dubke, White House communications director: Resigned June 2, 2017.
- K.T. McFarland, deputy national security adviser: Resigned May 19, 2017.
- James Comey, director of the FBI: Fired May 9, 2017.
- Katie Walsh, White House deputy chief of staff: Resigned March 30, 2017.
- Michael T. Flynn, national security adviser: Resigned Feb. 13, 2017.
Who has left the Trump administration? Here is a list of 55 major departures
<p>On Tuesday, President Donald Trump tweeted that he had fired John Bolton, his third national security adviser, over disagreements over major foreign policy challenges.</p>www.boston25news.com
Trump Supporters HAVE to admit this....
LOL wrong! The left HAVE to admit that DC is swarming with DC swamp establishment rats and Trump is frequently forced to choose people from the swamp because he has no choice.
Really? That's your explanation? Guess he didn't drain it then, did he? Another Trump failure.
Oh gee what a convenient excuse.Good help is hard to findIf you're going to blindly support Trump every time he fires someone or someone quits under pressure from Trump, and blame the person leaving, then you have to admit he does NOT "hire the best people".
ALLLLL these people are BAD!
Can't have it both ways, buttheads.
- John Bolton, national security adviser: Fired Sept. 10, 2019
- Jason Greenblatt, special envoy for Middle East peace: Resignation announced on Sept. 5, 2019.
- Dan Coats, director of national intelligence: Resigned on July 28, 2019.
- R. Alexander Acosta, Labor secretary: Resigned on July 12, 2019.
- Patrick M. Shanahan, acting secretary of defense: Announced resignation June 18, 2019.
- Sarah Huckabee Sanders, White House press secretary: Announced resignation June 13, 2019
- Rod J. Rosenstein, deputy U.S. attorney general: Resignation effective May 11, 2019.
- Randolph D. Alles, director of the Secret Service: Resigned April 8, 2019.
- Kirstjen Nielsen, Homeland Security secretary: Resigned April 7, 2019.
- Linda E. McMahon, administrator of the Small Business Administration: Resignation announced March 29, 2019.
- Bill Shine, deputy chief of staff for communications: Resigned March 8, 2019 to manage Trump's communications operation.
- Heather Wilson, Air Force secretary: Resignation announced March 8, 2019.
- Brock Long, administrator of the Federal Emergency Management Agency: Resignation announced Feb. 13, 2019.
- Raj Shah, principal deputy press secretary: Resigned on Jan. 5, 2019.
- Jim Mattis, secretary of Defense: : Resignation announced Dec. 20, 2018.
- Ryan Zinke, secretary of Interior: : Resignation announced Dec. 15, 2018.
- Nick Ayers, chief of staff to Vice President Mike Pence: Resignation announced Dec. 9, 2018.
- John F. Kelly, White House chief of staff: Resignation announced Dec. 8, 2018.
- Jeff Sessions, U.S. attorney general: Fired Nov. 7, 2018.
- Nikki Haley, U.S. ambassador to the United Nations: Resignation announced Oct. 9, 2018.
- Donald McGahn, White House counsel: Resignation announced Aug. 29, 2018.
- Scott Pruitt, Environmental Protection Agency administrator: Resignation announced July 5, 2018.
- Joseph W. Hagin, deputy chief of staff: Resignation announced June 19, 2018.
- Maj. Gen. Ricky Waddell, deputy national security adviser: Resignation announced April 12, 2018.
- Nadia Schadlow, deputy national security adviser for strategy: Resignation announced April 11, 2018.
- Thomas Bossert, Homeland Security department adviser: Resigned April 10, 2018.
- Michael Anton, National Security Council spokesman: Resigned April 8, 2018.
- Rex Tillerson, secretary of State: Fired on March 13, 2018.
- Hope Hicks, White House communications director: Resigned March 29, 2018.
- David Shulkin, secretary of Veterans Affairs: Fired March 28, 2018.
- Lt. Gen. H. R. McMaster, national security adviser: Resignation announced March 22, 2018.
- Andrew McCabe, deputy director of the FBI: Fired March 16, 2018.
- Rick Dearborn, White House deputy chief of staff: Resigned March 16, 2018.
- John McEntee, Trump's personal aide: Resigned March 12, 2018.
- Gary Cohn, director of White House National Economic Council: Resignation announced March 6, 2018.
- Rachel Brand, associate U.S. attorney general: Resigned Feb. 9, 2018.
- David Sorensen, White House speechwriter: Resigned Feb. 9, 2018.
- Rob Porter, White House staff secretary: Resigned Feb. 7, 2018.
- Brenda Fitzgerald, director of the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention: Resigned Jan. 31, 2018.
- Carl Higbie, chief of external affairs for Corporation for National and Community Service: Resigned Jan. 18, 2018.
- Omarosa Manigault Newman, director of communications for the White House Office of Public Liaison: Fired Dec. 13, 2017.
- Dina Powell, deputy national security adviser for strategy: Resignation announced Dec. 8, 2017.
- Tom Price, secretary of Health and Human Services: Resigned Sept. 29, 2017.
- Keith Schiller, director of Oval Office operations: Resigned Sept. 20, 2017.
- Sebastian Gorka, adviser to Trump: Resigned Aug. 25, 2017.
- George Sifakis, director of White House Office of Public Liaison: Resignation announced Aug. 18, 2017.
- Stephen Bannon, chief strategist to Trump: Resigned Aug. 18, 2017.
- Anthony Scaramucci, White House communications director: Fired July 31, 2017.
- Reince Priebus, White House chief of staff: Resigned July 28, 2017.
- Sean Spicer, White House press secretary: Resigned July 21, 2017.
- Mike Dubke, White House communications director: Resigned June 2, 2017.
- K.T. McFarland, deputy national security adviser: Resigned May 19, 2017.
- James Comey, director of the FBI: Fired May 9, 2017.
- Katie Walsh, White House deputy chief of staff: Resigned March 30, 2017.
- Michael T. Flynn, national security adviser: Resigned Feb. 13, 2017.
Who has left the Trump administration? Here is a list of 55 major departures
<p>On Tuesday, President Donald Trump tweeted that he had fired John Bolton, his third national security adviser, over disagreements over major foreign policy challenges.</p>www.boston25news.com
If you're going to blindly support Trump every time he fires someone or someone quits under pressure from Trump, and blame the person leaving, then you have to admit he does NOT "hire the best people".
ALLLLL these people are BAD!
Can't have it both ways, buttheads.
- John Bolton, national security adviser: Fired Sept. 10, 2019
- Jason Greenblatt, special envoy for Middle East peace: Resignation announced on Sept. 5, 2019.
- Dan Coats, director of national intelligence: Resigned on July 28, 2019.
- R. Alexander Acosta, Labor secretary: Resigned on July 12, 2019.
- Patrick M. Shanahan, acting secretary of defense: Announced resignation June 18, 2019.
- Sarah Huckabee Sanders, White House press secretary: Announced resignation June 13, 2019
- Rod J. Rosenstein, deputy U.S. attorney general: Resignation effective May 11, 2019.
- Randolph D. Alles, director of the Secret Service: Resigned April 8, 2019.
- Kirstjen Nielsen, Homeland Security secretary: Resigned April 7, 2019.
- Linda E. McMahon, administrator of the Small Business Administration: Resignation announced March 29, 2019.
- Bill Shine, deputy chief of staff for communications: Resigned March 8, 2019 to manage Trump's communications operation.
- Heather Wilson, Air Force secretary: Resignation announced March 8, 2019.
- Brock Long, administrator of the Federal Emergency Management Agency: Resignation announced Feb. 13, 2019.
- Raj Shah, principal deputy press secretary: Resigned on Jan. 5, 2019.
- Jim Mattis, secretary of Defense: : Resignation announced Dec. 20, 2018.
- Ryan Zinke, secretary of Interior: : Resignation announced Dec. 15, 2018.
- Nick Ayers, chief of staff to Vice President Mike Pence: Resignation announced Dec. 9, 2018.
- John F. Kelly, White House chief of staff: Resignation announced Dec. 8, 2018.
- Jeff Sessions, U.S. attorney general: Fired Nov. 7, 2018.
- Nikki Haley, U.S. ambassador to the United Nations: Resignation announced Oct. 9, 2018.
- Donald McGahn, White House counsel: Resignation announced Aug. 29, 2018.
- Scott Pruitt, Environmental Protection Agency administrator: Resignation announced July 5, 2018.
- Joseph W. Hagin, deputy chief of staff: Resignation announced June 19, 2018.
- Maj. Gen. Ricky Waddell, deputy national security adviser: Resignation announced April 12, 2018.
- Nadia Schadlow, deputy national security adviser for strategy: Resignation announced April 11, 2018.
- Thomas Bossert, Homeland Security department adviser: Resigned April 10, 2018.
- Michael Anton, National Security Council spokesman: Resigned April 8, 2018.
- Rex Tillerson, secretary of State: Fired on March 13, 2018.
- Hope Hicks, White House communications director: Resigned March 29, 2018.
- David Shulkin, secretary of Veterans Affairs: Fired March 28, 2018.
- Lt. Gen. H. R. McMaster, national security adviser: Resignation announced March 22, 2018.
- Andrew McCabe, deputy director of the FBI: Fired March 16, 2018.
- Rick Dearborn, White House deputy chief of staff: Resigned March 16, 2018.
- John McEntee, Trump's personal aide: Resigned March 12, 2018.
- Gary Cohn, director of White House National Economic Council: Resignation announced March 6, 2018.
- Rachel Brand, associate U.S. attorney general: Resigned Feb. 9, 2018.
- David Sorensen, White House speechwriter: Resigned Feb. 9, 2018.
- Rob Porter, White House staff secretary: Resigned Feb. 7, 2018.
- Brenda Fitzgerald, director of the Centers for Disease Control and Prevention: Resigned Jan. 31, 2018.
- Carl Higbie, chief of external affairs for Corporation for National and Community Service: Resigned Jan. 18, 2018.
- Omarosa Manigault Newman, director of communications for the White House Office of Public Liaison: Fired Dec. 13, 2017.
- Dina Powell, deputy national security adviser for strategy: Resignation announced Dec. 8, 2017.
- Tom Price, secretary of Health and Human Services: Resigned Sept. 29, 2017.
- Keith Schiller, director of Oval Office operations: Resigned Sept. 20, 2017.
- Sebastian Gorka, adviser to Trump: Resigned Aug. 25, 2017.
- George Sifakis, director of White House Office of Public Liaison: Resignation announced Aug. 18, 2017.
- Stephen Bannon, chief strategist to Trump: Resigned Aug. 18, 2017.
- Anthony Scaramucci, White House communications director: Fired July 31, 2017.
- Reince Priebus, White House chief of staff: Resigned July 28, 2017.
- Sean Spicer, White House press secretary: Resigned July 21, 2017.
- Mike Dubke, White House communications director: Resigned June 2, 2017.
- K.T. McFarland, deputy national security adviser: Resigned May 19, 2017.
- James Comey, director of the FBI: Fired May 9, 2017.
- Katie Walsh, White House deputy chief of staff: Resigned March 30, 2017.
- Michael T. Flynn, national security adviser: Resigned Feb. 13, 2017.
Who has left the Trump administration? Here is a list of 55 major departures
<p>On Tuesday, President Donald Trump tweeted that he had fired John Bolton, his third national security adviser, over disagreements over major foreign policy challenges.</p>www.boston25news.com